07/17/2024 | Signed by Governor | |||
06/25/2024 | Passed By House. Votes: 40 YES 1 ABSENT | |||
06/11/2024 | Reported Out of Committee (Labor) in House with 1 Favorable, 7 On Its Merits | |||
05/15/2024 | Assigned to Labor Committee in House | |||
05/14/2024 | Passed By Senate. Votes: 20 YES 1 ABSENT | |||
05/14/2024 | Amendment SA 1 to SB 239 - Passed By Senate. Votes: 21 YES | |||
05/14/2024 | Lifted From Table in Senate | |||
05/07/2024 | Amendment SA 1 to SB 239 - Introduced and Placed With Bill | |||
03/27/2024 | Laid On Table in Senate | |||
03/20/2024 | Reported Out of Committee (Labor) in Senate with 2 Favorable, 2 On Its Merits | |||
03/13/2024 | Introduced and Assigned to Labor Committee in Senate |