08/29/2024 | Signed by Governor | |||
06/27/2024 | Passed By House. Votes: 41 YES | |||
06/25/2024 | Reported Out of Committee (Appropriations) in House with 6 On Its Merits | |||
06/20/2024 | Assigned to Appropriations Committee in House | |||
06/18/2024 | Reported Out of Committee (Health & Human Development) in House with 9 On Its Merits | |||
06/12/2024 | Assigned to Health & Human Development Committee in House | |||
06/11/2024 | Passed By Senate. Votes: 20 YES 1 ABSENT | |||
06/11/2024 | Reported Out of Committee (Finance) in Senate with 4 On Its Merits | |||
06/06/2024 | Adopted in lieu of the original bill SB 254, and Assigned to Finance Committee in Senate |