09/26/2024 | Signed by Governor | |||
06/26/2024 | Passed By House. Votes: 37 YES 4 ABSENT | |||
06/18/2024 | Reported Out of Committee (Economic Development/Banking/Insurance & Commerce) in House with 7 On Its Merits | |||
06/12/2024 | Assigned to Economic Development/Banking/Insurance & Commerce Committee in House | |||
06/11/2024 | Passed By Senate. Votes: 21 YES | |||
06/11/2024 | Amendment SA 1 to SB 256 - Passed By Senate. Votes: 21 YES | |||
06/11/2024 | Amendment SA 1 to SB 256 - Introduced and Placed With Bill | |||
04/17/2024 | Reported Out of Committee (Judiciary) in Senate with 4 Favorable, 1 On Its Merits | |||
03/21/2024 | Introduced and Assigned to Judiciary Committee in Senate |