LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
Delaware DE
Legislatures
2023-2024 Regular Session
Senate
Bills
SB257
Action History
DE
Delaware Senate Bill SB257
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
Delaware 2023-2024 Regular Session
Delaware Senate Bill SB257
Action History
09/26/2024
Signed by Governor
06/25/2024
Passed By House. Votes: 40 YES 1 ABSENT
05/21/2024
Reported Out of Committee (Public Safety & Homeland Security) in House with 2 Favorable, 5 On Its Merits
04/24/2024
Assigned to Public Safety & Homeland Security Committee in House
04/23/2024
Passed By Senate. Votes: 20 YES 1 ABSENT
04/17/2024
Reported Out of Committee (Banking, Business, Insurance & Technology) in Senate with 4 Favorable, 1 On Its Merits
03/28/2024
Introduced and Assigned to Banking, Business, Insurance & Technology Committee in Senate