09/19/2024 | Signed by Governor | |||
06/30/2024 | Passed By House. Votes: 41 YES | |||
06/27/2024 | Reported Out of Committee (Public Safety & Homeland Security) in House with 1 Favorable, 6 On Its Merits | |||
06/26/2024 | Assigned to Public Safety & Homeland Security Committee in House | |||
06/25/2024 | Passed By Senate. Votes: 21 YES | |||
06/25/2024 | Amendment SA 2 to SB 262 - Passed By Senate. Votes: 21 YES | |||
06/25/2024 | Amendment SA 1 to SB 262 - Stricken in Senate | |||
06/25/2024 | Amendment SA 2 to SB 262 - Introduced and Placed With Bill | |||
06/12/2024 | Amendment SA 1 to SB 262 - Introduced and Placed With Bill | |||
06/12/2024 | Reported Out of Committee (Environment, Energy & Transportation) in Senate with 4 Favorable, 2 On Its Merits | |||
04/11/2024 | Introduced and Assigned to Environment, Energy & Transportation Committee in Senate |