LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
Delaware DE
Legislatures
2023-2024 Regular Session
Senate
Bills
SB264
Action History
DE
Delaware Senate Bill SB264
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
Delaware 2023-2024 Regular Session
Delaware Senate Bill SB264
Action History
06/20/2024
Signed by Governor
05/21/2024
Passed By House. Votes: 40 YES 1 ABSENT
05/14/2024
Reported Out of Committee (Natural Resources & Energy) in House with 8 On Its Merits
05/08/2024
Assigned to Natural Resources & Energy Committee in House
05/07/2024
Passed By Senate. Votes: 19 YES 2 ABSENT
04/24/2024
Reported Out of Committee (Environment, Energy & Transportation) in Senate with 6 On Its Merits
04/11/2024
Introduced and Assigned to Environment, Energy & Transportation Committee in Senate