LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
Delaware DE
Legislatures
2023-2024 Regular Session
Senate
Bills
SB267
Action History
DE
Delaware Senate Bill SB267
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
Delaware 2023-2024 Regular Session
Delaware Senate Bill SB267
Action History
08/15/2024
Signed by Governor
06/13/2024
Passed By House. Votes: 40 YES 1 ABSENT
06/11/2024
Reported Out of Committee (Economic Development/Banking/Insurance & Commerce) in House with 10 On Its Merits
05/08/2024
Assigned to Economic Development/Banking/Insurance & Commerce Committee in House
05/07/2024
Passed By Senate. Votes: 19 YES 2 ABSENT
04/24/2024
Reported Out of Committee (Banking, Business, Insurance & Technology) in Senate with 5 On Its Merits
04/16/2024
Introduced and Assigned to Banking, Business, Insurance & Technology Committee in Senate