LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
Delaware DE
Legislatures
2023-2024 Regular Session
Senate
Bills
SB27
Action History
DE
Delaware Senate Bill SB27
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
Delaware 2023-2024 Regular Session
Delaware Senate Bill SB27
Action History
04/26/2023
Signed by Governor
03/28/2023
Passed By House. Votes: 41 YES
03/14/2023
Reported Out of Committee (Labor) in House with 9 Favorable, 1 On Its Merits
03/02/2023
Assigned to Labor Committee in House
01/26/2023
Passed By Senate. Votes: 20 YES 1 ABSENT
01/18/2023
Reported Out of Committee (Labor) in Senate with 4 Favorable, 2 On Its Merits
01/10/2023
Introduced and Assigned to Labor Committee in Senate