09/24/2024 | Signed by Governor | |||
06/25/2024 | Passed By House. Votes: 40 YES 1 ABSENT | |||
06/20/2024 | Reported Out of Committee (Appropriations) in House with 5 On Its Merits | |||
06/12/2024 | Assigned to Appropriations Committee in House | |||
06/11/2024 | Reported Out of Committee (Economic Development/Banking/Insurance & Commerce) in House with 6 Favorable, 1 On Its Merits | |||
05/21/2024 | Assigned to Economic Development/Banking/Insurance & Commerce Committee in House | |||
05/16/2024 | Passed By Senate. Votes: 20 YES 1 ABSENT | |||
05/16/2024 | Amendment SA 1 to SB 272 - Passed By Senate. Votes: 20 YES 1 ABSENT | |||
05/15/2024 | Reported Out of Committee (Finance) in Senate with 6 On Its Merits | |||
05/15/2024 | Assigned to Finance Committee in Senate | |||
05/08/2024 | Reported Out of Committee (Health & Social Services) in Senate with 5 Favorable, 2 On Its Merits | |||
05/07/2024 | Amendment SA 1 to SB 272 - Introduced and Placed With Bill | |||
04/23/2024 | Introduced and Assigned to Health & Social Services Committee in Senate |