LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
Delaware DE
Legislatures
2023-2024 Regular Session
Senate
Bills
SB274
Action History
DE
Delaware Senate Bill SB274
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
Delaware 2023-2024 Regular Session
Delaware Senate Bill SB274
Action History
09/30/2024
Signed by Governor
06/30/2024
Passed By House. Votes: 40 YES 1 ABSENT
06/26/2024
Reported Out of Committee (Transportation) in House with 8 On Its Merits
06/20/2024
Assigned to Transportation Committee in House
06/18/2024
Passed By Senate. Votes: 20 YES 1 ABSENT
06/12/2024
Reported Out of Committee (Environment, Energy & Transportation) in Senate with 1 Favorable, 5 On Its Merits
04/23/2024
Introduced and Assigned to Environment, Energy & Transportation Committee in Senate