09/30/2024 | Signed by Governor | |||
06/26/2024 | Passed By House. Votes: 35 YES 2 NO 4 ABSENT | |||
06/20/2024 | Reported Out of Committee (Public Safety & Homeland Security) in House with 1 Favorable, 4 On Its Merits | |||
06/06/2024 | Assigned to Public Safety & Homeland Security Committee in House | |||
05/23/2024 | Passed By Senate. Votes: 21 YES | |||
05/23/2024 | Amendment SA 1 to SB 275 - Passed By Senate. Votes: 21 YES | |||
05/21/2024 | Reported Out of Committee (Environment, Energy & Transportation) in Senate with 7 On Its Merits | |||
05/20/2024 | Amendment SA 1 to SB 275 - Introduced and Placed With Bill | |||
04/23/2024 | Introduced and Assigned to Environment, Energy & Transportation Committee in Senate |