05/07/2024 | Signed by Governor | |||
05/07/2024 | Passed By House. Votes: 35 YES 6 ABSENT | |||
04/24/2024 | Reported Out of Committee (Administration) in House with 1 Favorable, 4 On Its Merits | |||
04/19/2024 | Re-Assigned to Administration Committee in House | |||
04/18/2024 | Assigned to Transportation Committee in House | |||
04/17/2024 | Passed By Senate. Votes: 21 YES | |||
04/17/2024 | Reported Out of Committee (Executive) in Senate with 7 Favorable | |||
04/16/2024 | Introduced and Assigned to Executive Committee in Senate |