09/26/2024 | Signed by Governor | |||
06/26/2024 | Passed By House. Votes: 40 YES 1 ABSENT | |||
06/18/2024 | Reported Out of Committee (Administration) in House with 5 On Its Merits | |||
06/06/2024 | Assigned to Administration Committee in House | |||
05/23/2024 | Passed By Senate. Votes: 18 YES 3 ABSENT | |||
05/22/2024 | Reported Out of Committee (Elections & Government Affairs) in Senate with 4 Favorable, 2 On Its Merits | |||
05/22/2024 | Suspension of Rules in Senate | |||
05/13/2024 | Introduced and Assigned to Elections & Government Affairs Committee in Senate |