09/30/2024 | Signed by Governor | |||
06/30/2024 | Passed By House. Votes: 41 YES | |||
06/26/2024 | Reported Out of Committee (Natural Resources & Energy) in House with 5 Favorable, 3 On Its Merits | |||
06/06/2024 | Re-Assigned to Natural Resources & Energy Committee in House | |||
06/06/2024 | Assigned to Health & Human Development Committee in House | |||
05/23/2024 | Passed By Senate. Votes: 21 YES | |||
05/23/2024 | Amendment SA 1 to SB 289 - Passed By Senate. Votes: 21 YES | |||
05/22/2024 | Amendment SA 1 to SB 289 - Introduced and Placed With Bill | |||
05/15/2024 | Reported Out of Committee (Environment, Energy & Transportation) in Senate with 1 Favorable, 4 On Its Merits | |||
05/08/2024 | Introduced and Assigned to Environment, Energy & Transportation Committee in Senate |