01/26/2023 | Signed by Governor | |||
01/26/2023 | Passed By House. Votes: 35 YES 5 NO 1 ABSENT | |||
01/24/2023 | Reported Out of Committee (Administration) in House with 5 On Its Merits | |||
01/19/2023 | Assigned to Administration Committee in House | |||
01/18/2023 | Passed By Senate. Votes: 17 YES 3 NO 1 ABSENT | |||
01/18/2023 | Amendment SA 1 to SB 29 - Passed By Senate. Votes: 20 YES 1 ABSENT | |||
01/18/2023 | Amendment SA 1 to SB 29 - Introduced and Placed With Bill | |||
01/18/2023 | Reported Out of Committee (Executive) in Senate with 7 On Its Merits | |||
01/12/2023 | Introduced and Assigned to Executive Committee in Senate |