09/30/2024 | Signed by Governor | |||
06/27/2024 | Passed By Senate. Votes: 21 YES | |||
06/26/2024 | Passed By House. Votes: 37 YES 4 ABSENT | |||
06/26/2024 | Amendment HA 2 to SB 292 - Passed In House by Voice Vote | |||
06/26/2024 | Amendment HA 1 to SB 292 - Stricken in House | |||
06/26/2024 | Amendment HA 2 to SB 292 - Introduced and Placed With Bill | |||
06/24/2024 | Amendment HA 1 to SB 292 - Introduced and Placed With Bill | |||
06/12/2024 | Reported Out of Committee (Education) in House with 13 On Its Merits | |||
06/06/2024 | Assigned to Education Committee in House | |||
05/23/2024 | Passed By Senate. Votes: 18 YES 3 ABSENT | |||
05/22/2024 | Reported Out of Committee (Education) in Senate with 6 On Its Merits | |||
05/08/2024 | Introduced and Assigned to Education Committee in Senate |