08/09/2024 | Signed by Governor | |||
06/30/2024 | Passed By Senate. Votes: 20 YES 1 NOT VOTING | |||
06/30/2024 | Suspension of Rules in Senate | |||
06/30/2024 | Passed By House. Votes: 25 YES 14 NO 2 NOT VOTING | |||
06/30/2024 | Amendment HA 1 to SS 1 - Passed In House by Voice Vote | |||
06/28/2024 | Amendment HA 1 to SS 1 - Introduced and Placed With Bill | |||
06/27/2024 | Reported Out of Committee (Economic Development/Banking/Insurance & Commerce) in House with 4 Favorable, 3 On Its Merits | |||
06/21/2024 | Not Enough Signatures to Release | |||
06/06/2024 | Assigned to Economic Development/Banking/Insurance & Commerce Committee in House | |||
05/23/2024 | Passed By Senate. Votes: 14 YES 5 NO 2 ABSENT | |||
05/23/2024 | was introduced and adopted in lieu of SB 293 |