LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
Delaware DE
Legislatures
2023-2024 Regular Session
Senate
Bills
SB297
Action History
DE
Delaware Senate Bill SB297
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
Delaware 2023-2024 Regular Session
Delaware Senate Bill SB297
Action History
09/26/2024
Signed by Governor
06/26/2024
Passed By House. Votes: 40 YES 1 ABSENT
06/12/2024
Reported Out of Committee (Education) in House with 3 Favorable, 8 On Its Merits
05/22/2024
Assigned to Education Committee in House
05/21/2024
Passed By Senate. Votes: 21 YES
05/15/2024
Reported Out of Committee (Education) in Senate with 3 Favorable, 3 On Its Merits
05/09/2024
Introduced and Assigned to Education Committee in Senate