06/13/2024 | Defeated By House. Votes: 25 YES 10 NO 6 NOT VOTING | |||
06/13/2024 | Amendment HA 2 to SB 3 - Passed In House by Voice Vote | |||
04/23/2024 | Amendment HA 2 to SB 3 - Introduced and Placed With Bill | |||
03/07/2024 | Amendment HA 1 to SB 3 - Stricken in House | |||
02/29/2024 | Amendment HA 1 to SB 3 - Introduced and Placed With Bill | |||
05/17/2023 | Reported Out of Committee (Administration) in House with 4 On Its Merits | |||
05/05/2023 | Assigned to Administration Committee in House | |||
05/04/2023 | Passed By Senate. Votes: 15 YES 5 NO 1 ABSENT | |||
04/26/2023 | Reported Out of Committee (Executive) in Senate with 4 Favorable | |||
03/09/2023 | Introduced and Assigned to Executive Committee in Senate |