LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
Delaware DE
Legislatures
2023-2024 Regular Session
Senate
Bills
SB302
Action History
DE
Delaware Senate Bill SB302
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
Delaware 2023-2024 Regular Session
Delaware Senate Bill SB302
Action History
07/17/2024
Signed by Governor
06/26/2024
Passed By House. Votes: 40 YES 1 ABSENT
06/18/2024
Reported Out of Committee (Economic Development/Banking/Insurance & Commerce) in House with 1 Favorable, 7 On Its Merits
06/12/2024
Assigned to Economic Development/Banking/Insurance & Commerce Committee in House
06/11/2024
Passed By Senate. Votes: 21 YES
05/22/2024
Reported Out of Committee (Banking, Business, Insurance & Technology) in Senate with 5 On Its Merits
05/14/2024
Introduced and Assigned to Banking, Business, Insurance & Technology Committee in Senate