08/03/2023 | Signed by Governor | |||
06/22/2023 | Passed By House. Votes: 39 YES 2 ABSENT | |||
06/21/2023 | Reported Out of Committee (Appropriations) in House with 5 On Its Merits | |||
06/15/2023 | Assigned to Appropriations Committee in House | |||
06/14/2023 | Reported Out of Committee (Education) in House with 15 On Its Merits | |||
03/29/2023 | Not Worked in Committee | |||
03/15/2023 | Assigned to Education Committee in House | |||
03/14/2023 | Passed By Senate. Votes: 20 YES 1 ABSENT | |||
03/14/2023 | Amendment SA 1 to SB 32 - Passed By Senate. Votes: 20 YES 1 ABSENT | |||
03/08/2023 | Reported Out of Committee (Finance) in Senate with 6 On Its Merits | |||
03/03/2023 | Assigned to Finance Committee in Senate | |||
02/17/2023 | Amendment SA 1 to SB 32 - Introduced and Placed With Bill | |||
01/25/2023 | Reported Out of Committee (Education) in Senate with 7 Favorable | |||
01/18/2023 | Introduced and Assigned to Education Committee in Senate |