Delaware 2023-2024 Regular Session

Delaware Senate Bill SB327

Introduced
6/27/24  
Engrossed
6/30/24  
Introduced
6/27/24  
Engrossed
6/30/24  
Enrolled
6/30/24  

Caption

An Act Making Appropriations For Certain Grants-in-aid For The Fiscal Year Ending June 30, 2025; Specifying Certain Procedures, Conditions And Limitations For The Expenditure Of Such Funds; Amending The Fiscal Year 2025 Appropriations Act; Amending The Fiscal Year 2025 One-time Supplemental Appropriations Act; And Amending Certain Statutory Provisions.

Companion Bills

No companion bills found.

Similar Bills

DE HB197

An Act Making Appropriations For Certain Grants-in-aid For The Fiscal Year Ending June 30, 2024; Specifying Certain Procedures, Conditions And Limitations For The Expenditure Of Such Funds; Amending The Fiscal Year 2024 Appropriations Act; Amending The Fiscal Year 2024 One-time Supplemental Appropriations Act; And Amending Certain Statutory Provisions.

DE SB160

A Bond And Capital Improvements Act Of The State Of Delaware And Certain Of Its Authorities For The Fiscal Year Ending June 30, 2024; Authorizing The Issuance Of General Obligation Bonds Of The State; Appropriating Funds From The Transportation Trust Fund; Authorizing The Issuance Of Revenue Bonds Of The Delaware Transportation Authority; Appropriating Special Funds Of The Delaware Transportation Authority; Appropriating General Funds Of The State; Reprogramming Certain Funds Of The State; Specifying Certain Procedures, Conditions And Limitations For The Expenditure Of Such Funds; And Amending Certain Statutory Provisions.

DE SB40

A Bond And Capital Improvements Act Of The State Of Delaware And Certain Of Its Authorities For The Fiscal Year Ending June 30, 2024; Authorizing The Issuance Of General Obligation Bonds Of The State; Appropriating Funds From The Transportation Trust Fund; Authorizing The Issuance Of Revenue Bonds Of The Delaware Transportation Authority; Appropriating Special Funds Of The Delaware Transportation Authority; Appropriating General Funds Of The State; Reprogramming Certain Funds Of The State; Specifying Certain Procedures, Conditions And Limitations For The Expenditure Of Such Funds; And Amending Certain Statutory Provisions.

DE HB325

A Bond And Capital Improvements Act Of The State Of Delaware And Certain Of Its Authorities For The Fiscal Year Ending June 30, 2025; Authorizing The Issuance Of General Obligation Bonds Of The State; Appropriating Funds From The Transportation Trust Fund; Authorizing The Issuance Of Revenue Bonds Of The Delaware Transportation Authority; Appropriating Special Funds Of The Delaware Transportation Authority; Appropriating General Funds Of The State; Reprogramming Certain Funds Of The State; Specifying Certain Procedures, Conditions And Limitations For The Expenditure Of Such Funds; And Amending Certain Statutory Provisions.

DE SB30

A Bond And Capital Improvements Act Of The State Of Delaware And Certain Of Its Authorities For The Fiscal Year Ending June 30, 2026; Authorizing The Issuance Of General Obligation Bonds Of The State; Appropriating Funds From The Transportation Trust Fund; Authorizing The Issuance Of Revenue Bonds Of The Delaware Transportation Authority; Appropriating Special Funds Of The Delaware Transportation Authority; Appropriating General Funds Of The State; Reprogramming Certain Funds Of The State; Specifying Certain Procedures, Conditions And Limitations For The Expenditure Of Such Funds; And Amending Certain Statutory Provisions.

DE SCR59

Recognizing May 22, 2023 As National Maritime Day.

DE SCR169

Recognizing May 22, 2024 As National Maritime Day.

DE SCR41

Recognizing 2023 As The 100th Anniversary Of The Founding Of The Seaford Kiwanis Club.