LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
Delaware DE
Legislatures
2023-2024 Regular Session
Senate
Bills
SB329
Action History
DE
Delaware Senate Bill SB329
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
Delaware 2023-2024 Regular Session
Delaware Senate Bill SB329
Action History
09/26/2024
Signed by Governor
06/30/2024
Passed By House. Votes: 41 YES
06/27/2024
Reported Out of Committee (Revenue & Finance) in House with 2 Favorable, 8 On Its Merits
06/27/2024
Assigned to Revenue & Finance Committee in House
06/26/2024
Passed By Senate. Votes: 21 YES
06/20/2024
Reported Out of Committee (Executive) in Senate with 7 On Its Merits
06/11/2024
Introduced and Assigned to Executive Committee in Senate