LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
Delaware DE
Legislatures
2023-2024 Regular Session
Senate
Bills
SB33
Action History
DE
Delaware Senate Bill SB33
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
Delaware 2023-2024 Regular Session
Delaware Senate Bill SB33
Action History
06/09/2023
Signed by Governor
04/04/2023
Passed By House. Votes: 39 YES 2 ABSENT
03/29/2023
Reported Out of Committee (Judiciary) in House with 6 Favorable, 4 On Its Merits
03/15/2023
Assigned to Judiciary Committee in House
03/14/2023
Passed By Senate. Votes: 20 YES 1 ABSENT
03/08/2023
Reported Out of Committee (Judiciary) in Senate with 4 Favorable, 1 On Its Merits
01/18/2023
Introduced and Assigned to Judiciary Committee in Senate