05/16/2023 | Signed by Governor | |||
05/02/2023 | Passed By House. Votes: 40 YES 1 ABSENT | |||
04/04/2023 | Reported Out of Committee (Sunset Committee (Policy Analysis & Government Accountability)) in House with 4 Favorable | |||
03/30/2023 | Assigned to Sunset Committee (Policy Analysis & Government Accountability) Committee in House | |||
03/29/2023 | Passed By Senate. Votes: 21 YES | |||
03/15/2023 | Reported Out of Committee (Judiciary) in Senate with 6 Favorable | |||
03/07/2023 | Re-Assigned to Judiciary Committee in Senate | |||
01/25/2023 | Introduced and Assigned to Legislative Oversight & Sunset Committee in Senate |