LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
Delaware DE
Legislatures
2023-2024 Regular Session
Senate
Bills
SB36
Action History
DE
Delaware Senate Bill SB36
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
Delaware 2023-2024 Regular Session
Delaware Senate Bill SB36
Action History
09/21/2023
Signed by Governor
05/02/2023
Passed By House. Votes: 40 YES 1 ABSENT
04/26/2023
Reported Out of Committee (Public Safety & Homeland Security) in House with 6 Favorable, 1 On Its Merits
04/06/2023
Assigned to Public Safety & Homeland Security Committee in House
04/05/2023
Passed By Senate. Votes: 20 YES 1 ABSENT
03/29/2023
Reported Out of Committee (Corrections & Public Safety) in Senate with 5 Favorable
01/26/2023
Introduced and Assigned to Corrections & Public Safety Committee in Senate