LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
Delaware DE
Legislatures
2023-2024 Regular Session
Senate
Bills
SB39
Action History
DE
Delaware Senate Bill SB39
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
Delaware 2023-2024 Regular Session
Delaware Senate Bill SB39
Action History
04/25/2023
Passed By House. Votes: 38 YES 3 ABSENT
04/05/2023
Reported Out of Committee (Administration) in House with 1 Favorable, 4 On Its Merits
03/16/2023
Assigned to Administration Committee in House
03/15/2023
Passed By Senate. Votes: 21 YES
03/08/2023
Reported Out of Committee (Executive) in Senate with 4 Favorable, 3 On Its Merits
01/26/2023
Introduced and Assigned to Executive Committee in Senate