LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
Delaware DE
Legislatures
2023-2024 Regular Session
Senate
Bills
SB43
Action History
DE
Delaware Senate Bill SB43
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
Delaware 2023-2024 Regular Session
Delaware Senate Bill SB43
Action History
09/14/2023
Signed by Governor
06/20/2023
Passed By House. Votes: 39 YES 2 ABSENT
06/14/2023
Reported Out of Committee (Judiciary) in House with 3 Favorable, 5 On Its Merits
06/08/2023
Assigned to Judiciary Committee in House
06/08/2023
Passed By Senate. Votes: 20 YES 1 ABSENT
06/01/2023
Adopted in lieu of the original bill SB 43, and Assigned to Finance Committee in Senate