08/09/2023 | Signed by Governor | |||
06/29/2023 | Passed By House. Votes: 24 YES 17 ABSENT | |||
06/09/2023 | Reported Out of Committee (Appropriations) in House with 1 Favorable, 3 On Its Merits | |||
05/04/2023 | Assigned to Appropriations Committee in House | |||
05/03/2023 | Reported Out of Committee (Health & Human Development) in House with 5 Favorable, 3 On Its Merits, 1 Unfavorable | |||
04/26/2023 | Not Worked in Committee | |||
04/20/2023 | Assigned to Health & Human Development Committee in House | |||
04/06/2023 | Passed By Senate. Votes: 15 YES 5 NO 1 ABSENT | |||
04/06/2023 | Amendment SA 2 to SB 52 - Stricken in Senate | |||
04/06/2023 | Amendment SA 1 to SB 52 - Defeated By Senate. Votes: 5 YES 15 NO 1 ABSENT | |||
04/06/2023 | Amendment SA 2 to SB 52 - Introduced and Placed With Bill | |||
04/06/2023 | Amendment SA 1 to SB 52 - Introduced and Placed With Bill | |||
04/05/2023 | Reported Out of Committee (Finance) in Senate with 5 On Its Merits | |||
03/29/2023 | Assigned to Finance Committee in Senate | |||
03/29/2023 | Reported Out of Committee (Health & Social Services) in Senate with 3 Favorable, 3 On Its Merits | |||
03/01/2023 | Introduced and Assigned to Health & Social Services Committee in Senate |