LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
Delaware DE
Legislatures
2023-2024 Regular Session
Senate
Bills
SB54
Action History
DE
Delaware Senate Bill SB54
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
Delaware 2023-2024 Regular Session
Delaware Senate Bill SB54
Action History
03/30/2023
Signed by Governor
03/16/2023
Passed By House. Votes: 39 YES 2 ABSENT
03/14/2023
Reported Out of Committee (Natural Resources & Energy) in House with 9 On Its Merits
03/10/2023
Assigned to Natural Resources & Energy Committee in House
03/09/2023
Passed By Senate. Votes: 20 YES 1 ABSENT
03/08/2023
Reported Out of Committee (Environment, Energy & Transportation) in Senate with 1 Favorable, 7 On Its Merits
03/01/2023
Introduced and Assigned to Environment, Energy & Transportation Committee in Senate