07/26/2023 | Signed by Governor | |||
06/20/2023 | Passed By House. Votes: 39 YES 2 ABSENT | |||
06/14/2023 | Reported Out of Committee (Health & Human Development) in House with 3 Favorable, 6 On Its Merits | |||
06/08/2023 | Assigned to Health & Human Development Committee in House | |||
06/08/2023 | Passed By Senate. Votes: 21 YES | |||
06/08/2023 | Amendment SA 1 to SB 55 - Passed By Senate. Votes: 20 YES 1 ABSENT | |||
06/01/2023 | Amendment SA 1 to SB 55 - Introduced and Placed With Bill | |||
03/08/2023 | Reported Out of Committee (Health & Social Services) in Senate with 7 Favorable | |||
03/01/2023 | Introduced and Assigned to Health & Social Services Committee in Senate |