06/29/2023 | Signed by Governor | |||
06/14/2023 | Passed By Senate. Votes: 20 YES 1 ABSENT | |||
06/06/2023 | Passed By House. Votes: 40 YES 1 ABSENT | |||
06/06/2023 | Amendment HA 1 to SB 56 - Passed In House by Voice Vote | |||
06/06/2023 | Amendment HA 1 to SB 56 - Introduced and Placed With Bill | |||
05/02/2023 | Reported Out of Committee (Natural Resources & Energy) in House with 7 Favorable, 3 On Its Merits | |||
03/10/2023 | Assigned to Natural Resources & Energy Committee in House | |||
03/08/2023 | Reported Out of Committee (Environment, Energy & Transportation) in Senate with 1 Favorable, 7 On Its Merits | |||
03/01/2023 | Introduced and Assigned to Environment, Energy & Transportation Committee in Senate |