LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
Delaware DE
Legislatures
2023-2024 Regular Session
Senate
Bills
SB57
Action History
DE
Delaware Senate Bill SB57
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
Delaware 2023-2024 Regular Session
Delaware Senate Bill SB57
Action History
06/09/2023
Signed by Governor
05/18/2023
Passed By House. Votes: 31 YES 8 NO 2 ABSENT
05/17/2023
Reported Out of Committee (Administration) in House with 4 On Its Merits
04/20/2023
Assigned to Administration Committee in House
04/06/2023
Passed By Senate. Votes: 16 YES 3 NO 2 ABSENT
03/29/2023
Reported Out of Committee (Elections & Government Affairs) in Senate with 4 Favorable, 1 On Its Merits
03/01/2023
Introduced and Assigned to Elections & Government Affairs Committee in Senate