09/21/2023 | Signed by Governor | |||
06/30/2023 | Passed By Senate. Votes: 21 YES | |||
06/29/2023 | Passed By House. Votes: 24 YES 1 NOT VOTING 16 ABSENT | |||
06/29/2023 | Amendment HA 1 to SB 6 - Passed In House by Voice Vote | |||
06/29/2023 | Amendment HA 2 to HA 1 - Passed In House by Voice Vote | |||
06/28/2023 | Amendment HA 1 to SB 6 - Introduced and Placed With Bill | |||
06/13/2023 | Reported Out of Committee (Administration) in House with 5 On Its Merits | |||
06/07/2023 | Assigned to Administration Committee in House | |||
06/06/2023 | Amendment SA 1 to SB 6 - Passed By Senate. Votes: 21 YES | |||
06/06/2023 | Amendment SA 1 to SB 6 - Introduced and Placed With Bill | |||
05/17/2023 | Reported Out of Committee (Environment, Energy & Transportation) in Senate with 5 Favorable | |||
05/10/2023 | Introduced and Assigned to Environment, Energy & Transportation Committee in Senate |