05/25/2023 | Signed by Governor | |||
05/18/2023 | Passed By Senate. Votes: 19 YES 2 ABSENT | |||
05/18/2023 | Passed By House. Votes: 38 YES 1 NO 2 ABSENT | |||
05/18/2023 | Amendment HA 2 to SB 64 - Passed In House by Voice Vote | |||
05/18/2023 | Amendment HA 1 to SB 64 - Stricken in House | |||
05/18/2023 | Amendment HA 2 to SB 64 - Introduced and Placed With Bill | |||
05/16/2023 | Amendment HA 1 to SB 64 - Introduced and Placed With Bill | |||
05/10/2023 | Reported Out of Committee (Gaming & Parimutuels) in House with 2 Favorable, 6 On Its Merits | |||
04/06/2023 | Assigned to Gaming & Parimutuels Committee in House | |||
04/04/2023 | Passed By Senate. Votes: 21 YES | |||
03/29/2023 | Reported Out of Committee (Elections & Government Affairs) in Senate with 1 Favorable, 4 On Its Merits | |||
03/09/2023 | Introduced and Assigned to Elections & Government Affairs Committee in Senate |