LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
Delaware DE
Legislatures
2023-2024 Regular Session
Senate
Bills
SB71
Action History
DE
Delaware Senate Bill SB71
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
Delaware 2023-2024 Regular Session
Delaware Senate Bill SB71
Action History
06/27/2023
Signed by Governor
05/09/2023
Passed By House. Votes: 38 YES 3 ABSENT
05/03/2023
Reported Out of Committee (Health & Human Development) in House with 3 Favorable, 6 On Its Merits
04/26/2023
Assigned to Health & Human Development Committee in House
04/25/2023
Passed By Senate. Votes: 21 YES
04/05/2023
Reported Out of Committee (Health & Social Services) in Senate with 6 Favorable
03/28/2023
Introduced and Assigned to Health & Social Services Committee in Senate