08/31/2023 | Signed by Governor | |||
06/21/2023 | Passed By House. Votes: 26 YES 12 NO 1 NOT VOTING 2 ABSENT | |||
06/14/2023 | Reported Out of Committee (Appropriations) in House with 5 On Its Merits | |||
06/07/2023 | Assigned to Appropriations Committee in House | |||
06/06/2023 | Reported Out of Committee (Revenue & Finance) in House with 1 Favorable, 6 On Its Merits | |||
06/01/2023 | Assigned to Revenue & Finance Committee in House | |||
05/18/2023 | Passed By Senate. Votes: 17 YES 3 NO 1 ABSENT | |||
05/18/2023 | was introduced and adopted in lieu of SB 72 |