06/30/2023 | Signed by Governor | |||
06/21/2023 | Passed By House. Votes: 39 YES 2 ABSENT | |||
06/07/2023 | Reported Out of Committee (Health & Human Development) in House with 1 Favorable, 12 On Its Merits | |||
05/17/2023 | Assigned to Health & Human Development Committee in House | |||
05/16/2023 | Passed By Senate. Votes: 21 YES | |||
05/16/2023 | Amendment SA 1 to SB 74 - Passed By Senate. Votes: 21 YES | |||
05/11/2023 | Amendment SA 1 to SB 74 - Introduced and Placed With Bill | |||
05/03/2023 | Reported Out of Committee (Health & Social Services) in Senate with 3 Favorable, 3 On Its Merits | |||
04/19/2023 | Introduced and Assigned to Health & Social Services Committee in Senate |