09/11/2023 | Signed by Governor | |||
06/30/2023 | Passed By Senate. Votes: 21 YES | |||
06/29/2023 | Passed By House. Votes: 25 YES 16 ABSENT | |||
06/29/2023 | Amendment HA 1 to SS 2 - Passed In House by Voice Vote | |||
06/29/2023 | Amendment HA 1 to SS 2 - Introduced and Placed With Bill | |||
06/20/2023 | Reported Out of Committee (Economic Development/Banking/Insurance & Commerce) in House with 3 Favorable, 5 On Its Merits, 1 Unfavorable | |||
06/15/2023 | Assigned to Economic Development/Banking/Insurance & Commerce Committee in House | |||
06/14/2023 | Passed By Senate. Votes: 20 YES 1 ABSENT | |||
06/14/2023 | Amendment SA 1 to SS 2 - Passed By Senate. Votes: 20 YES 1 ABSENT | |||
06/14/2023 | Amendment SA 1 to SS 2 - Introduced and Placed With Bill | |||
06/13/2023 | was introduced and adopted in lieu of SB 8 |