LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
Delaware DE
Legislatures
2023-2024 Regular Session
Senate
Bills
SB81
Action History
DE
Delaware Senate Bill SB81
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
Delaware 2023-2024 Regular Session
Delaware Senate Bill SB81
Action History
07/17/2023
Signed by Governor
06/30/2023
Passed By House. Votes: 41 YES
06/14/2023
Reported Out of Committee (Judiciary) in House with 3 Favorable, 6 On Its Merits
05/17/2023
Assigned to Judiciary Committee in House
05/16/2023
Passed By Senate. Votes: 21 YES
05/03/2023
Reported Out of Committee (Judiciary) in Senate with 7 On Its Merits
04/06/2023
Introduced and Assigned to Judiciary Committee in Senate