09/21/2023 | Signed by Governor | |||
06/13/2023 | Passed By House. Votes: 36 YES 5 ABSENT | |||
06/09/2023 | Reported Out of Committee (Appropriations) in House with 1 Favorable, 3 On Its Merits | |||
06/07/2023 | Assigned to Appropriations Committee in House | |||
06/06/2023 | Reported Out of Committee (Economic Development/Banking/Insurance & Commerce) in House with 3 Favorable, 6 On Its Merits | |||
05/12/2023 | Assigned to Economic Development/Banking/Insurance & Commerce Committee in House | |||
05/11/2023 | Passed By Senate. Votes: 21 YES | |||
05/11/2023 | Amendment SA 1 to SS 1 - Passed By Senate. Votes: 20 YES 1 ABSENT | |||
05/04/2023 | Amendment SA 1 to SS 1 - Introduced and Placed With Bill | |||
05/02/2023 | Reported Out of Committee (Finance) in Senate with 4 On Its Merits | |||
04/26/2023 | Assigned to Finance Committee in Senate | |||
04/26/2023 | Reported Out of Committee (Banking, Business, Insurance & Technology) in Senate with 1 Favorable, 4 On Its Merits | |||
04/26/2023 | Adopted in lieu of the original bill SB 83, and Assigned to Banking, Business, Insurance & Technology Committee in Senate |