08/22/2023 | Signed by Governor | |||
06/29/2023 | Passed By House. Votes: 25 YES 16 ABSENT | |||
06/29/2023 | Amendment HA 1 to SS 1 - Stricken in House | |||
06/16/2023 | Amendment HA 1 to SS 1 - Introduced and Placed With Bill | |||
06/06/2023 | Reported Out of Committee (Revenue & Finance) in House with 4 Favorable, 5 On Its Merits | |||
06/01/2023 | Assigned to Revenue & Finance Committee in House | |||
05/18/2023 | Passed By Senate. Votes: 20 YES 1 ABSENT | |||
05/17/2023 | Adopted in lieu of the original bill SB 87, and Assigned to Finance Committee in Senate |