LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
Delaware DE
Legislatures
2023-2024 Regular Session
Senate
Bills
SB89
Action History
DE
Delaware Senate Bill SB89
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
Delaware 2023-2024 Regular Session
Delaware Senate Bill SB89
Action History
06/30/2023
Signed by Governor
06/06/2023
Passed By House. Votes: 40 YES 1 ABSENT
05/16/2023
Reported Out of Committee (Public Safety & Homeland Security) in House with 5 Favorable
05/12/2023
Assigned to Public Safety & Homeland Security Committee in House
05/11/2023
Passed By Senate. Votes: 20 YES 1 ABSENT
05/03/2023
Reported Out of Committee (Environment, Energy & Transportation) in Senate with 3 Favorable, 4 On Its Merits
04/19/2023
Introduced and Assigned to Environment, Energy & Transportation Committee in Senate