07/17/2023 | Signed by Governor | |||
06/30/2023 | Passed By Senate. Votes: 21 YES | |||
06/29/2023 | Passed By House. Votes: 25 YES 16 ABSENT | |||
06/29/2023 | Amendment HA 1 to SB 9 - Passed In House by Voice Vote | |||
06/28/2023 | Amendment HA 1 to SB 9 - Introduced and Placed With Bill | |||
06/28/2023 | Reported Out of Committee (Appropriations) in House with 4 On Its Merits | |||
06/07/2023 | Assigned to Appropriations Committee in House | |||
06/07/2023 | Reported Out of Committee (Health & Human Development) in House with 3 Favorable, 7 On Its Merits | |||
05/17/2023 | Assigned to Health & Human Development Committee in House | |||
05/16/2023 | Amendment SA 1 to SB 9 - Passed By Senate. Votes: 21 YES | |||
05/16/2023 | Amendment SA 1 to SB 9 - Introduced and Placed With Bill | |||
05/11/2023 | Reported Out of Committee (Finance) in Senate with 4 On Its Merits | |||
05/11/2023 | Assigned to Finance Committee in Senate | |||
05/10/2023 | Reported Out of Committee (Health & Social Services) in Senate with 4 Favorable, 1 On Its Merits | |||
05/08/2023 | Introduced and Assigned to Health & Social Services Committee in Senate |