LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
Delaware DE
Legislatures
2023-2024 Regular Session
Senate
Bills
SB90
Action History
DE
Delaware Senate Bill SB90
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
Delaware 2023-2024 Regular Session
Delaware Senate Bill SB90
Action History
06/27/2023
Signed by Governor
06/13/2023
Passed By House. Votes: 36 YES 5 ABSENT
06/06/2023
Reported Out of Committee (Economic Development/Banking/Insurance & Commerce) in House with 2 Favorable, 7 On Its Merits
05/18/2023
Assigned to Economic Development/Banking/Insurance & Commerce Committee in House
05/17/2023
Passed By Senate. Votes: 19 YES 2 ABSENT
05/10/2023
Reported Out of Committee (Elections & Government Affairs) in Senate with 1 Favorable, 4 On Its Merits
04/19/2023
Introduced and Assigned to Elections & Government Affairs Committee in Senate