LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
Delaware DE
Legislatures
2023-2024 Regular Session
Senate
Bills
SB95
Action History
DE
Delaware Senate Bill SB95
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
Delaware 2023-2024 Regular Session
Delaware Senate Bill SB95
Action History
05/31/2023
Signed by Governor
05/04/2023
Passed By House. Votes: 39 YES 2 ABSENT
05/02/2023
Reported Out of Committee (Public Safety & Homeland Security) in House with 6 Favorable, 2 On Its Merits
04/28/2023
Assigned to Public Safety & Homeland Security Committee in House
04/27/2023
Passed By Senate. Votes: 21 YES
04/26/2023
Reported Out of Committee (Environment, Energy & Transportation) in Senate with 6 Favorable
04/25/2023
Adopted in lieu of the original bill SB 95, and Assigned to Environment, Energy & Transportation Committee in Senate