08/31/2023 | Signed by Governor | |||
06/28/2023 | Passed By Senate. Votes: 20 YES 1 ABSENT | |||
06/21/2023 | Passed By House. Votes: 39 YES 2 ABSENT | |||
06/21/2023 | Amendment HA 1 to SB 98 - Passed In House by Voice Vote | |||
06/21/2023 | Amendment HA 1 to SB 98 - Introduced and Placed With Bill | |||
05/16/2023 | Reported Out of Committee (Health & Human Development) in House with 2 Favorable, 7 On Its Merits | |||
05/10/2023 | Assigned to Health & Human Development Committee in House | |||
05/09/2023 | Passed By Senate. Votes: 20 YES 1 NO | |||
05/03/2023 | Reported Out of Committee (Health & Social Services) in Senate with 6 Favorable | |||
04/25/2023 | Introduced and Assigned to Health & Social Services Committee in Senate |