LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
Delaware DE
Legislatures
2023-2024 Regular Session
Senate
Bills
SB99
Action History
DE
Delaware Senate Bill SB99
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
Delaware 2023-2024 Regular Session
Delaware Senate Bill SB99
Action History
06/15/2023
Reported Out of Committee (Housing) in House with 5 Favorable, 2 On Its Merits
05/18/2023
Assigned to Housing Committee in House
05/17/2023
Passed By Senate. Votes: 15 YES 4 NO 2 ABSENT
05/10/2023
Reported Out of Committee (Housing & Land Use) in Senate with 4 Favorable, 1 On Its Merits
04/25/2023
Introduced and Assigned to Housing & Land Use Committee in Senate