Delaware 2023-2024 Regular Session

Delaware Senate Bill SCR130 Latest Draft

Bill / Draft Version

                            SPONSOR:      Sen. Brown & Sen. Lockman & Sen. Pettyjohn & Sen. Pinkney & Rep. Dorsey Walker & Rep. Baumbach & Rep. Minor-Brown & Rep. Neal & Rep. Chukwuocha       Sens. Gay, Hansen, Hocker, Hoffner, Mantzavinos, Sokola, Walsh, Wilson; Reps. Bolden, Cooke, Dukes, Griffith, K. Johnson, Lambert, Morrison, Osienski, Parker Selby, Yearick           DELAWARE STATE SENATE   152nd GENERAL ASSEMBLY       SENATE CONCURRENT RESOLUTION NO. 130       RECOGNIZING JUNE 19, 2024, AS "JUNETEENTH NATIONAL INDEPENDENCE DAY" IN THE STATE OF DELAWARE.      

     

     SPONSOR:      Sen. Brown & Sen. Lockman & Sen. Pettyjohn & Sen. Pinkney & Rep. Dorsey Walker & Rep. Baumbach & Rep. Minor-Brown & Rep. Neal & Rep. Chukwuocha       Sens. Gay, Hansen, Hocker, Hoffner, Mantzavinos, Sokola, Walsh, Wilson; Reps. Bolden, Cooke, Dukes, Griffith, K. Johnson, Lambert, Morrison, Osienski, Parker Selby, Yearick     

SPONSOR: Sen. Brown & Sen. Lockman & Sen. Pettyjohn & Sen. Pinkney & Rep. Dorsey Walker & Rep. Baumbach & Rep. Minor-Brown & Rep. Neal & Rep. Chukwuocha
Sens. Gay, Hansen, Hocker, Hoffner, Mantzavinos, Sokola, Walsh, Wilson; Reps. Bolden, Cooke, Dukes, Griffith, K. Johnson, Lambert, Morrison, Osienski, Parker Selby, Yearick

 SPONSOR:  

 Sen. Brown & Sen. Lockman & Sen. Pettyjohn & Sen. Pinkney & Rep. Dorsey Walker & Rep. Baumbach & Rep. Minor-Brown & Rep. Neal & Rep. Chukwuocha 

 Sens. Gay, Hansen, Hocker, Hoffner, Mantzavinos, Sokola, Walsh, Wilson; Reps. Bolden, Cooke, Dukes, Griffith, K. Johnson, Lambert, Morrison, Osienski, Parker Selby, Yearick 

   

 DELAWARE STATE SENATE 

 152nd GENERAL ASSEMBLY 

   

 SENATE CONCURRENT RESOLUTION NO. 130 

   

 RECOGNIZING JUNE 19, 2024, AS "JUNETEENTH NATIONAL INDEPENDENCE DAY" IN THE STATE OF DELAWARE. 

   

  WHEREAS, the final Emancipation Proclamation signed by President Abraham Lincoln on January 1, 1863, changed the federal legal status of over 3.5 million enslaved African Americans in designated areas of the south from slave to free, although the implementation of Lincolns order came slowly over the duration of the Civil War; and   WHEREAS, June 19, 1865, is recognized as the date the Union General Gordon Granger, upon arriving in Galveston, Texas, issued General Order Number Three, which notified the last enslaved Americans in southern areas denoted in the Emancipation Proclamation of their new legal status; and   WHEREAS, General Grangers General Order Number Three was issued nearly two and a half years after the final issuance of the Emancipation Proclamation, over a month after the end of the Civil War; and   WHEREAS, slavery was officially outlawed across the entire United States on December 18, 1865, with the ratification of the 13th Amendment to the Constitution, which freed slaves in the final two slave states in AmericaKentucky and Delaware; and   WHEREAS, Delaware ratified the 13  th   Amendment to the Constitution in February 1901; and   WHEREAS, African Americans who had been enslaved thereafter celebrated June 19th as Juneteenth National Independence Day to signify the anniversary of their emancipation; and   WHEREAS, the freed Women and Men handed down this tradition from generation to generation as inspiration and encouragement for future generations; and   WHEREAS, this year marks the 159th anniversary of Juneteenth National Independence Day, which calls for celebrations to honor the memory of all those who endured slavery, especially those who moved from slavery to freedom and to encourage self-development and respect for all cultures; and   WHEREAS, on October 27, 2021, Governor John Carney signed House Bill No. 119 establishing Juneteenth as a state holiday in Delaware; and   WHEREAS, the history behind celebrating Juneteenth should be remembered as the event continues to receive increased recognition across the country and the world; and   WHEREAS, the example of faith, hope, love, strength, and character of those who endured and overcame slavery remains a lesson for all Americans today, regardless of background, region, or race.   NOW, THEREFORE:   BE IT RESOLVED  by the Senate of the 152nd General Assembly of the State of Delaware, the House of Representatives concurring therein,  that June 19, 2024, is hereby recognized as Juneteenth National Independence Day in the State of Delaware.   BE IT FURTHER RESOLVED  that  the people of the State of Delaware are encouraged to reflect upon the significant roles and many contributions of African Americans to Delaware and our country throughout history and today, and to celebrate this day with appropriate activities and events that honor this rich legacy.      

 WHEREAS, the final Emancipation Proclamation signed by President Abraham Lincoln on January 1, 1863, changed the federal legal status of over 3.5 million enslaved African Americans in designated areas of the south from slave to free, although the implementation of Lincolns order came slowly over the duration of the Civil War; and 

 WHEREAS, June 19, 1865, is recognized as the date the Union General Gordon Granger, upon arriving in Galveston, Texas, issued General Order Number Three, which notified the last enslaved Americans in southern areas denoted in the Emancipation Proclamation of their new legal status; and 

 WHEREAS, General Grangers General Order Number Three was issued nearly two and a half years after the final issuance of the Emancipation Proclamation, over a month after the end of the Civil War; and 

 WHEREAS, slavery was officially outlawed across the entire United States on December 18, 1865, with the ratification of the 13th Amendment to the Constitution, which freed slaves in the final two slave states in AmericaKentucky and Delaware; and 

 WHEREAS, Delaware ratified the 13  th   Amendment to the Constitution in February 1901; and 

 WHEREAS, African Americans who had been enslaved thereafter celebrated June 19th as Juneteenth National Independence Day to signify the anniversary of their emancipation; and 

 WHEREAS, the freed Women and Men handed down this tradition from generation to generation as inspiration and encouragement for future generations; and 

 WHEREAS, this year marks the 159th anniversary of Juneteenth National Independence Day, which calls for celebrations to honor the memory of all those who endured slavery, especially those who moved from slavery to freedom and to encourage self-development and respect for all cultures; and 

 WHEREAS, on October 27, 2021, Governor John Carney signed House Bill No. 119 establishing Juneteenth as a state holiday in Delaware; and 

 WHEREAS, the history behind celebrating Juneteenth should be remembered as the event continues to receive increased recognition across the country and the world; and 

 WHEREAS, the example of faith, hope, love, strength, and character of those who endured and overcame slavery remains a lesson for all Americans today, regardless of background, region, or race. 

 NOW, THEREFORE: 

 BE IT RESOLVED  by the Senate of the 152nd General Assembly of the State of Delaware, the House of Representatives concurring therein,  that June 19, 2024, is hereby recognized as Juneteenth National Independence Day in the State of Delaware. 

 BE IT FURTHER RESOLVED  that  the people of the State of Delaware are encouraged to reflect upon the significant roles and many contributions of African Americans to Delaware and our country throughout history and today, and to celebrate this day with appropriate activities and events that honor this rich legacy. 

   

  SYNOPSIS   This Resolution proclaims June 19, 2024, as "Juneteenth National Independence Day" in Delaware and encourages the people of Delaware to reflect upon the significant roles and many contributions of African Americans, and to celebrate this day with appropriate activities and events.   Author: Senator Brown  

 SYNOPSIS 

 This Resolution proclaims June 19, 2024, as "Juneteenth National Independence Day" in Delaware and encourages the people of Delaware to reflect upon the significant roles and many contributions of African Americans, and to celebrate this day with appropriate activities and events. 

 Author: Senator Brown