Delaware 2023-2024 Regular Session

Delaware Senate Bill SCR180 Latest Draft

Bill / Draft Version

                            SPONSOR:      Sen. Walsh & Rep. Minor-Brown           DELAWARE STATE SENATE   152nd GENERAL ASSEMBLY       SENATE CONCURRENT RESOLUTION NO. 180       DESIGNATING OCTOBER 6, 2024, AS A DAY OF HONOR FOR THE MARQUIS DE LAFAYETTE IN DELAWARE.      

     

     SPONSOR:      Sen. Walsh & Rep. Minor-Brown     

SPONSOR: Sen. Walsh & Rep. Minor-Brown

 SPONSOR:  

 Sen. Walsh & Rep. Minor-Brown 

   

 DELAWARE STATE SENATE 

 152nd GENERAL ASSEMBLY 

   

 SENATE CONCURRENT RESOLUTION NO. 180 

   

 DESIGNATING OCTOBER 6, 2024, AS A DAY OF HONOR FOR THE MARQUIS DE LAFAYETTE IN DELAWARE. 

   

   WHEREAS, in 2024-2025 each of the 24 states that Revolutionary War hero, Major General Lafayette revisited in 1824, including Delaware, are planning ceremonies and celebrations; and    WHEREAS, Lafayette, a 19-year-old French orphan of military descent, arrived in Philadelphia on July 22, 1777, asking to serve without pay in the American Revolution, and with the political support of Benjamin Franklin, several weeks later was in Delaware, standing with George Washington on top of Iron Hill, studying British troop movements below; and     WHEREAS, on September 6, 1777, Lafayette attended an American Council of War on his 20th birthday, at the Hale Byrnes House in Stanton, Delaware; and    WHEREAS, after being wounded yet fighting with distinction at the Battle of the Brandywine on September 11, 1777, he was given command of his own division. Lafayette is known to have been in Claymont, Brandywine Village, Quaker Hill, Wilmington, Newport, Stanton, Christiana, Iron Hill, historic New Castle, and other locations along the Delaware River as he passed back and forth throughout the length of the war; and    WHEREAS, he played an important role both politically and militarily throughout the American Revolution, including the resounding defeat of the British at the Battle of Yorktown on October 19, 1781; and    WHEREAS, after fighting in both the American and the French Revolutions, the now 67-year-old war hero accepted an invitation from the U.S. Congress and President James Monroe to visit the United States, visiting each of the (then 24) states over the course of thirteen months; and     WHEREAS, on October 6, 1824, a committee of prominent citizens of New Castle County met Lafayette at the Pennsylvania State line near Naamans Road and proceeded down Philadelphia Pike into Wilmington. He was feted several times along the way and was later made the Delaware Masonss first Grand Master Honorius; and    WHEREAS, all Delawareans are encouraged to reflect on and learn from Lafayettes example of heroism, courage, and commitment to freedom and democracy.    NOW, THEREFORE:    BE IT RESOLVED by the Senate of the 152  nd   General Assembly of the State of Delaware, the House of Representatives concurring therein, that the General Assembly designates October 6, 2024, as a Day of Honor for the Marquis de Lafayette in Delaware.      

  WHEREAS, in 2024-2025 each of the 24 states that Revolutionary War hero, Major General Lafayette revisited in 1824, including Delaware, are planning ceremonies and celebrations; and 

  WHEREAS, Lafayette, a 19-year-old French orphan of military descent, arrived in Philadelphia on July 22, 1777, asking to serve without pay in the American Revolution, and with the political support of Benjamin Franklin, several weeks later was in Delaware, standing with George Washington on top of Iron Hill, studying British troop movements below; and  

  WHEREAS, on September 6, 1777, Lafayette attended an American Council of War on his 20th birthday, at the Hale Byrnes House in Stanton, Delaware; and 

  WHEREAS, after being wounded yet fighting with distinction at the Battle of the Brandywine on September 11, 1777, he was given command of his own division. Lafayette is known to have been in Claymont, Brandywine Village, Quaker Hill, Wilmington, Newport, Stanton, Christiana, Iron Hill, historic New Castle, and other locations along the Delaware River as he passed back and forth throughout the length of the war; and 

  WHEREAS, he played an important role both politically and militarily throughout the American Revolution, including the resounding defeat of the British at the Battle of Yorktown on October 19, 1781; and 

  WHEREAS, after fighting in both the American and the French Revolutions, the now 67-year-old war hero accepted an invitation from the U.S. Congress and President James Monroe to visit the United States, visiting each of the (then 24) states over the course of thirteen months; and  

  WHEREAS, on October 6, 1824, a committee of prominent citizens of New Castle County met Lafayette at the Pennsylvania State line near Naamans Road and proceeded down Philadelphia Pike into Wilmington. He was feted several times along the way and was later made the Delaware Masonss first Grand Master Honorius; and 

  WHEREAS, all Delawareans are encouraged to reflect on and learn from Lafayettes example of heroism, courage, and commitment to freedom and democracy. 

  NOW, THEREFORE: 

  BE IT RESOLVED by the Senate of the 152  nd   General Assembly of the State of Delaware, the House of Representatives concurring therein, that the General Assembly designates October 6, 2024, as a Day of Honor for the Marquis de Lafayette in Delaware. 

   

  SYNOPSIS   This Resolution designates October 6, 2024 as a day of Honor for the Marquis de Lafayette in Delaware.   Author: Senator Walsh  

 SYNOPSIS 

 This Resolution designates October 6, 2024 as a day of Honor for the Marquis de Lafayette in Delaware. 

 Author: Senator Walsh